TX HB2311 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the portion retained by a municipality or county of certain fines imposed for a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the portion retained by a municipality or county of certain fines imposed for a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Courts
Courts--General
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Courts
Courts--General
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road