TX HB2318 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to facilities of the hospital system of the Reagan Hospital District of Reagan County, Texas.
Title
Relating to facilities of the hospital system of the Reagan Hospital District of Reagan County, Texas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#320 |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1014 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Committee report printed and distributed
Subjects
REAGAN COUNTY
REAGAN HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Safety
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
REAGAN HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Safety
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital