TX HB2325 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information and communication of governmental and other entities regarding disasters and health and human services.
Title
Relating to information and communication of governmental and other entities regarding disasters and health and human services.
Sponsors
Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] |
Rep. Jessica Farrar [D] | Rep. Armando Walle [D] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] | Sen. Kelly Hancock [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1776 (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#286 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#286 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1776 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#286 |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
9-1-1 EMERGENCY TELEPHONE NUMBER
City Government
City Government--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Electronic Information Systems
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, DIVISION OF THE DEPT. OF PUBLIC SAFETY
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
INFORMATION & REFERRAL NETWORK, TEXAS
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
INTERNET
Political Subdivisions
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
TEXAS A&M AGRILIFE EXTENSION SERVICE
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXTENSION SERVICE
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
VOLUNTEERS
City Government
City Government--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Electronic Information Systems
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, DIVISION OF THE DEPT. OF PUBLIC SAFETY
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
INFORMATION & REFERRAL NETWORK, TEXAS
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
INTERNET
Political Subdivisions
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
TEXAS A&M AGRILIFE EXTENSION SERVICE
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXTENSION SERVICE
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
VOLUNTEERS