TX HB2346 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to persons entitled to a mechanic's lien on real property.
Title
Relating to persons entitled to a mechanic's lien on real property.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB921 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
INTERIOR DESIGNERS
MECHANICS' LIENS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
MECHANICS' LIENS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2346 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02346I.htm |