TX HB2363 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to permitting certain foster homes to store firearms and ammunition in the same locked location.
Title
Relating to permitting certain foster homes to store firearms and ammunition in the same locked location.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1793 (Y: 85 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#920 (Y: 97 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Amendment tabled RV#864 (Y: 82 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#920 (Y: 97 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Amendment tabled RV#864 (Y: 82 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1793 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#920 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-01 | House | Record vote RV#864 |
2019-05-01 | House | Amendment tabled 1-Meza |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Family
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Weapons
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Weapons