TX HB2366 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of motor fuel quality and motor fuel metering devices.
Title
Relating to the regulation of motor fuel quality and motor fuel metering devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1203 (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1203 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment