TX HB2377 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the development of brackish groundwater.
Title
Relating to the development of brackish groundwater.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1989 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#781 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1989 (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#781 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | House requests conference committee |
2017-05-26 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PERMITS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
WATER--CONSERVATION
Water--General
Water--Rights
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
WATER--CONSERVATION
Water--General
Water--Rights