TX HB2384 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to judicial compensation and assignment, the contributions to, benefits from, membership in, and administration of the Judicial Retirement System of Texas Plan One and Plan Two, and the compensation and retirement benefits of certain prosecutors and other members of the elected class of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to judicial compensation and assignment, the contributions to, benefits from, membership in, and administration of the Judicial Retirement System of Texas Plan One and Plan Two, and the compensation and retirement benefits of certain prosecutors and other members of the elected class of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1865 (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#849 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1865
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-10SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-03SenateRead first time
2019-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-01HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01HouseRecord vote RV#849
2019-05-01HousePassed
2019-05-01HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Y. Davis
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-30HouseAmended 6-Longoria and Wu
2019-04-30HouseAmended 5-Israel
2019-04-30HouseAmended 4-Craddick
2019-04-30HouseAmended 3-Flynn
2019-04-30HouseAmended 2-P. King and Geren
2019-04-30HouseAmended 1-Leach
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB387 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback