TX HB2386 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Placed on local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Placed on local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exclusion of the operation of certain vehicles from commercial driver's license requirements.
Title
Relating to the exclusion of the operation of certain vehicles from commercial driver's license requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#752 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB3571 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
HORSES
TRAILERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
HORSES
TRAILERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road