TX HB2419 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study conducted by the Texas Department of Transportation regarding the transportation needs of the Middle Rio Grande region of this state.
Title
Relating to a study conducted by the Texas Department of Transportation regarding the transportation needs of the Middle Rio Grande region of this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#711 (Y: 109 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#711 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Highways
RIO GRANDE RIVER
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
RIO GRANDE RIVER
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous