TX HB2424 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of a micro-credential certification program for public school educator continuing education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of a micro-credential certification program for public school educator continuing education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1734 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#625 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective immediately
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1734
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Education
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-25SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#625
2019-04-24HousePassed
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2044 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback