TX HB244 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prohibition of certain discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity or expression; providing an administrative penalty; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the prohibition of certain discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity or expression; providing an administrative penalty; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB151 (Similar To) 2019-02-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
DISCRIMINATION
GENDER IDENTITY & EXPRESSION
Housing
Housing--General
Labor
Labor--General
Labor--Management Relations
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
SEXUAL ORIENTATION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
DISCRIMINATION
GENDER IDENTITY & EXPRESSION
Housing
Housing--General
Labor
Labor--General
Labor--Management Relations
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
SEXUAL ORIENTATION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB244 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00244I.htm |