TX HB2440 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to transportation network companies; imposing and authorizing fees; requiring an occupational permit; authorizing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to transportation network companies; imposing and authorizing fees; requiring an occupational permit; authorizing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Rep. Lyle Larson [R] | Rep. John Kuempel [R] | Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D] |
Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] | Rep. Rodney Anderson [R] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] |
Rep. Byron Cook [R] | Rep. Gary Elkins [R] | Rep. Rick Galindo [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Debbie Riddle [R] | Rep. Ron Simmons [R] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] |
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PERMITS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PERMITS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration