TX HB2452 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to complaints filed with the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to complaints filed with the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#602 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Effective immediately
2019-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-04-29SenateRead first time
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#602
2019-04-24HousePassed
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback