TX HB2467 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training requirements applicable to a jailer at a private correctional facility.
Title
Relating to training requirements applicable to a jailer at a private correctional facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING