TX HB2490 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the system for maintaining records relating to children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to the system for maintaining records relating to children in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D] |
Rep. John Bucy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1236 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1236 |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--General
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--General
RECORDS MANAGEMENT