TX HB2496 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of a property as a historic landmark by a municipality.
Title
Relating to the designation of a property as a historic landmark by a municipality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#764 (Y: 124 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Record vote RV#670 (Y: 119 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#669 (Y: 41 N: 101 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - RV#668 (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#764 (Y: 124 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Record vote RV#670 (Y: 119 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#669 (Y: 41 N: 101 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - RV#668 (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#764 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#670 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#669 |
2019-04-25 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 2-Hinojosa |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#668 |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended 1-Cole |
2019-04-25 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-24 | House | Postponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1488 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--General
Historic Preservation & Museums
City Government--General
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--General
Historic Preservation & Museums