TX HB250 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to attorney's fees associated with certain court proceedings for cruelly treated animals; authorizing fees and costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to attorney's fees associated with certain court proceedings for cruelly treated animals; authorizing fees and costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#396 (Y: 87 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#356 (Y: 76 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#396
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#356
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback