TX HB2518 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the possession of two ounces or less of marihuana.
Title
Relating to the possession of two ounces or less of marihuana.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Toth [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. Carl Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MARIHUANA
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MARIHUANA
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses