TX HB253 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the protection of children by ensuring reports of abuse or neglect, protecting children from abuse and neglect, ensuring that births are reported, and prosecuting the offense of bigamy; providing criminal penalties.
Title
Relating to the protection of children by ensuring reports of abuse or neglect, protecting children from abuse and neglect, ensuring that births are reported, and prosecuting the offense of bigamy; providing criminal penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-19 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-18 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-15 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-15 | Record vote | |
2011-04-15 | Passed | |
2011-04-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-14 | Amended | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Human Services | |
2011-02-24 | Read first time | |
2011-02-18 | Filed |
Subjects
BIGAMY
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Marriage Relationship
Health
Health--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Marriage Relationship
Health
Health--General