TX HB253 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a strategic plan to address postpartum depression.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a strategic plan to address postpartum depression.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#365 (Y: 89 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Amended RV#341 (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-16HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-15HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-13SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#365
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#341
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-15HouseAmended 1-Swanson
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback