TX HB2559 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of a summons for certain persons charged with a violation of a condition of release on parole or to mandatory supervision.
Title
Relating to the issuance of a summons for certain persons charged with a violation of a condition of release on parole or to mandatory supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#999 (Y: 92 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#999 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |