TX HB2560 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a debris management plan and training.
Title
Relating to a debris management plan and training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-03 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, DIVISION OF THE DEPT. OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Environment
Environment--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXTENSION SERVICE
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, DIVISION OF THE DEPT. OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Environment
Environment--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXTENSION SERVICE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2560 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02560I.htm |