TX HB2572 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eliminating the state-required assessment instrument in social studies and the United States history end-of-course assessment instrument and to establishing a pilot program to develop a portfolio method to assess student performance in those courses.
Title
Relating to eliminating the state-required assessment instrument in social studies and the United States history end-of-course assessment instrument and to establishing a pilot program to develop a portfolio method to assess student performance in those courses.
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Patterson [R] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] | Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] |
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. James Talarico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
STATE AGENCIES' RULES