TX HB2583 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the calculation of costs in interagency contracts between certain state agencies and the State Office of Administrative Hearings.
Title
Relating to the calculation of costs in interagency contracts between certain state agencies and the State Office of Administrative Hearings.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1794 |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-05-03 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1794 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
Utilities
Utilities--General
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
Utilities
Utilities--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2583 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02583I.htm |