TX HB2600 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-29 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-29 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the records and reports required for purposes of the taxes imposed on cigars and other tobacco products.
Title
Relating to the records and reports required for purposes of the taxes imposed on cigars and other tobacco products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-25 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-14 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-07 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2011-03-15 | Read first time | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB2600 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB02600I.htm |