TX HB2620 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the movement of oversize or overweight vehicles, including the enforcement of motor vehicle size and weight limitations; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the movement of oversize or overweight vehicles, including the enforcement of motor vehicle size and weight limitations; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1916 (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Record vote RV#1207 (Y: 131 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - RV#1206 (Y: 123 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1916
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1207
2019-05-09HousePassed as amended
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1206
2019-05-09HouseAmended 1-VanDeaver
2019-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-08HouseAmended 1-Krause
2019-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2620
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02620I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02620H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02620E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02620S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02620F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2620&RcdVtNo=1206&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2620&RcdVtNo=1207&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2620&RcdVtNo=1916&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=172

Bill Comments

feedback