TX HB2623 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirements for a change of name for a person with a final felony conviction or a person required to register as a sex offender.
Title
Relating to the requirements for a change of name for a person with a final felony conviction or a person required to register as a sex offender.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#807 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#807 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#807 |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1697 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Committee report printed and distributed
Subjects
CHANGED & ASSUMED NAMES
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Family
Family--General
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Family
Family--General
SEXUAL OFFENDERS