TX HB2625 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to creating the criminal offense of fraudulent use or possession of credit card or debit card information.
Title
Relating to creating the criminal offense of fraudulent use or possession of credit card or debit card information.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Perez [D] | Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Craig Goldman [R] |
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#923 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#923 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#923 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended 2-Wu |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended 1-Perez |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CREDIT & DEBIT CARDS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
FRAUD
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
FRAUD