TX HB2646 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the adoption of a land bank program by the Texas State Affordable Housing Corporation.
Title
Relating to the adoption of a land bank program by the Texas State Affordable Housing Corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] |
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1036 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1036 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION, TEXAS STATE
Housing
Housing--Veterans
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
VETERANS' LAND BOARD
Housing
Housing--Veterans
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
VETERANS' LAND BOARD