TX HB2650 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedure for the sale by auction of real property pursuant to foreclosure of a tax lien.
Title
Relating to the procedure for the sale by auction of real property pursuant to foreclosure of a tax lien.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#731 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#731 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#731 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1285 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
AUCTIONS & AUCTIONEERS
FORECLOSURES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
FORECLOSURES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection