TX HB2665 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to receive certain tax revenue or pledge that revenue for the payment of obligations related to projects involving hotels.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain municipalities to receive certain tax revenue or pledge that revenue for the payment of obligations related to projects involving hotels.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
BORDER
City Government
City Government--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CONVENTIONS & CONVENTION CENTERS
Historic Preservation & Museums
HOTELS & MOTELS
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Parks
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
BORDER
City Government
City Government--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CONVENTIONS & CONVENTION CENTERS
Historic Preservation & Museums
HOTELS & MOTELS
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Parks
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM