TX HB2669 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authorization and regulation of social gaming establishments and the duties of the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation; providing civil and administrative penalties; authorizing a fee; requiring an occupational license.
Title
Relating to the authorization and regulation of social gaming establishments and the duties of the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation; providing civil and administrative penalties; authorizing a fee; requiring an occupational license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB889 (Similar To) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SOCIAL GAMING ACT OF 2019
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SOCIAL GAMING ACT OF 2019
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2669 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02669I.htm |