TX HB2701 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to county jailer training and continuing education requirements regarding interacting with pregnant women confined in jail.
Title
Relating to county jailer training and continuing education requirements regarding interacting with pregnant women confined in jail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#722 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#722 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
JAIL STANDARDS, COMMISSION ON
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Women
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
JAIL STANDARDS, COMMISSION ON
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Women