TX HB2712 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Channelview Improvement District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose fees and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Channelview Improvement District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose fees and taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1835 |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-05-03 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-02 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2019-04-01 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1835 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
CHANNELVIEW IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous