TX HB2730 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to civil actions involving the exercise of certain constitutional rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to civil actions involving the exercise of certain constitutional rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Amended RV#785 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-02 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-02 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-17HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-17SenateRemarks ordered printed
2019-05-17SenateRemarks ordered printed
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenatePassed
2019-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-01SenateRead first time
2019-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#785
2019-04-30HousePassed as amended
2019-04-30HouseAmended 1-Leach
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-29HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-29HouseAmended 1-Moody and Leach
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2162 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback