TX HB2733 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the scope of practice for chiropractors.
Title
Relating to the scope of practice for chiropractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-04-03 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1867 (Same As) 2019-05-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2733 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02733I.htm |