TX HB2738 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to employing, terminating, and reporting the misconduct of public school personnel and related entity personnel, including creating a registry of persons ineligible for hire; creating criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to employing, terminating, and reporting the misconduct of public school personnel and related entity personnel, including creating a registry of persons ineligible for hire; creating criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Mike Lang [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-03 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1256 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Electronic Information Systems
Labor
Labor--Management Relations
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
SEXUAL MISCONDUCT
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Electronic Information Systems
Labor
Labor--Management Relations
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
SEXUAL MISCONDUCT
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2738 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02738I.htm |