TX HB274 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the disaster reinvestment and infrastructure planning board and the creation of the disaster reinvestment and infrastructure planning revolving fund; making an appropriation.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the disaster reinvestment and infrastructure planning board and the creation of the disaster reinvestment and infrastructure planning revolving fund; making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#754 (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Amended RV#680 (Y: 120 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Amended RV#680 (Y: 120 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | House | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution |
2019-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#754 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#680 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended 1-S. Davis |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
DISASTER REINVESTMENT & INFRASTRUCTURE PLANNING BOARD
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Political Subdivisions
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
DISASTER REINVESTMENT & INFRASTRUCTURE PLANNING BOARD
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Political Subdivisions
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS