TX HB275 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a member of the armed services of the United States who is killed or fatally injured in the line of duty.
Title
Relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a member of the armed services of the United States who is killed or fatally injured in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] |
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. William Zedler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR23 (Enabling for) 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
SB196 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
SB196 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB275 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00275I.htm |