TX HB2766 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to electronic and other controlled substance prescriptions under the Texas Controlled Substances Act; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to electronic and other controlled substance prescriptions under the Texas Controlled Substances Act; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#993 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#993 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-02 | House | Postponed 5/2/19 4:00 PM |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF