TX HB2771 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality to issue permits for the discharge into water in this state of produced water, hydrostatic test water, and gas plant effluent resulting from certain oil and gas activities.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality to issue permits for the discharge into water in this state of produced water, hydrostatic test water, and gas plant effluent resulting from certain oil and gas activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1728 (Y: 109 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#473 (Y: 94 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Point of order sustained (amendment) RV#435 (Y: 105 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#434 (Y: 55 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#473 (Y: 94 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Point of order sustained (amendment) RV#435 (Y: 105 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#434 (Y: 55 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1728 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | House | Record vote RV#473 |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#435 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-16 | House | Point of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment(s) offered 5-Ramos |
2019-04-16 | House | Amended 4-J. Turner |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#434 |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 3-Zwiener |
2019-04-16 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment(s) offered 3-Zwiener |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment withdrawn 2-Gervin-Hawkins |
2019-04-16 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment(s) offered 2-Gervin-Hawkins |
2019-04-16 | House | Amended 1-Lozano |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1585 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
WATER
Water--General
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
WATER
Water--General