TX HB2782 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to decedents' estates, transfer on death deeds, and matters involving probate courts.
Title
Relating to decedents' estates, transfer on death deeds, and matters involving probate courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1888 (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1309 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1309 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1888 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1309 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-09 | House | Amended 2-Landgraf |
2019-05-09 | House | Amended 1-Wray |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1208 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Probate
Probate--Wills & Admin of Estates
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
Probate
Probate--Wills & Admin of Estates