TX HB2802 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the amounts, availability, and use of certain statutorily dedicated revenue and accounts; reducing or affecting the amounts of certain statutorily dedicated fees.
Title
Relating to the amounts, availability, and use of certain statutorily dedicated revenue and accounts; reducing or affecting the amounts of certain statutorily dedicated fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] |
Rep. Richard Raymond [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1136 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1136 |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-07 | House | Amended 6-Howard |
2019-05-07 | House | Amended 5-Howard |
2019-05-07 | House | Amended 4-Kacal |
2019-05-07 | House | Amended 3-Darby |
2019-05-07 | House | Amended 2-Darby |
2019-05-07 | House | Amended 1-Darby |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Coastal Affairs & Beaches
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON STATE
Energy
Energy--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TELEPHONES & TELEPHONE DIRECTORIES
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON STATE
Energy
Energy--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TELEPHONES & TELEPHONE DIRECTORIES
VEHICLE EMISSIONS