TX HB2818 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an Internet online dropout recovery education program for students at risk of dropping out of school.
Title
Relating to an Internet online dropout recovery education program for students at risk of dropping out of school.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1908 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Education
Subjects
DROPOUTS & AT-RISK STUDENTS
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
INTERNET
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
INTERNET
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development