TX HB2827 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to discrimination by a state agency against an applicant for or holder of an occupational license.
Title
Relating to discrimination by a state agency against an applicant for or holder of an occupational license.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] |
Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] |
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Terry Wilson [R] |
Rep. William Zedler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB444 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB17 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Referred to State Affairs
SB17 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
DISCRIMINATION
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Religion
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Religion
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2827 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02827I.htm |