TX HB2833 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain contracts requiring competitive bidding by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Title
Relating to certain contracts requiring competitive bidding by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1092 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Subjects
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Highways
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
TRAFFIC CONTROL
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Highways
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
TRAFFIC CONTROL
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2833 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02833I.htm |