TX HB2840 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right of a member of the public to address the governing body of a political subdivision at an open meeting of the body.
Title
Relating to the right of a member of the public to address the governing body of a political subdivision at an open meeting of the body.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Robert Guerra [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] |
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1014 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#955 (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1014 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#955 (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#1014 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#955 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--General
Open Meetings
Political Subdivisions
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--General
Open Meetings
Political Subdivisions