TX HB2843 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the examinations required for a barbering or cosmetology license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the examinations required for a barbering or cosmetology license.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-03-12HouseRead first time
2019-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2051 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Higher Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback