TX HB2867 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Sam Houston State University College of Osteopathic Medicine.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Sam Houston State University College of Osteopathic Medicine.
Sponsors
Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Ernest Bailes [R] |
Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1412 (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Co-sponsor authorized (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#176 (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Co-sponsor authorized (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#176 (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-15 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | House | Record vote RV#1412 |
2019-05-15 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-13 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-13 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-13 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-05 | House | Record vote RV#176 |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2346 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM